Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Velasquez, Maria, Velasquez, Rocky, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y, against Does 1 Through 10, General Motors Llc, represented by Valencia, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Maier, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaier, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty E-File |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act and fraud against General Motors LLC and unnamed defendants. The plaintiffs, Rocky Velasquez and Maria Velasquez, are individuals. The case is assigned to Judge Maier, Clare, in the Superior C...
Initial Complaint Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Summons Issued/Filed
Date: July 25, 2022*Case Management Conference
Date: November 29, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | C22-01506 CASE NAME: VELASQUEZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS *HEARING ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO PLN REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS, SET ONE FILED BY PLN ON 8/8/23 FILED BY: VELASQUEZ, ROCKY ... | |
September 14, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | C22-01506 CASE NAME: VELASQUEZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS HEARING ON DEMURRER TO: DEMURRER FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 6/29/23 FILED BY: GENERAL MOTORS LLC *TENTATIVE RULING:... | |
April 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | C22-01506 CASE NAME: VELASQUEZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION TO STRIKE DAMAGES FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS ON 1/31/23 FILED BY: GENERAL MOTORS LLC *TENTA... | |
March 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | C22-01506 CASE NAME: VELASQUEZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS HEARING ON DEMURRER TO: DEMURRER BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON 1/31/23 FILED BY: GENERAL MOTORS LLC *TENTATIVE RULING:* Th... | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CMC Notice - Fast Track *Case Management Conference Judge: Maier, Clare |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Initial Complaint Filed | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Summons Issued/Filed Summons Issued/Filed |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Service of Complaint and Summons | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.