Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crosby, Heafey, Roach & May, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Kraft, Lorraine, Kraft, Leonard, Grand Avenue Development, Ellwood, Patrick, Ellwood Commercial Real Estate, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 1998 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 1998 | |||
September 18, 1998 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Entire Action PURS TO DISML FILED 8-19-98 CONCLUDES ACTION | |
September 18, 1998 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
August 19, 1998 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Partial W/OUT PREJ AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY FILED | |
August 14, 1998 | |||
August 14, 1998 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed | |
August 14, 1998 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing 09/18/1998 08:59 AM D-21 | |
June 05, 1998 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference 08/14/1998 10:00 AM D-21 | |
April 29, 1998 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Partial W/O PREJ CMPLT AGAINST DEFT BROCKBANK/HUISH 1990 TRUST ONLY FILED. | |
March 23, 1998 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default and Non Military Affidavit Etc FILED & ENTERED 3-23-98 AS TO LEONARD KRAFT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.