Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Martinez Karla Beatriz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Martin H. Wegman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 41 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 DSU - MTN (Modification Hearing) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) (-Child Support-Health Care ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 2G, Wegman, Martin, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Wegman Martin |
|
May 30, 2017 | Hearing |
at 8:00 AM in Department 2G, Wegman, Martin, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Martin |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; ) | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; ) | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; ) | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; ) | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.