Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Ross Rodrick, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Martin H. Wegman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2019 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) | |
July 08, 2019 | Hearing |
DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Order - After Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:00 AM in Department 2H, Wegman, Martin, Presiding DSU - RFO (Modification Hearing) - Held - Order Made Judge: Martin |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) | |
June 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Responsive Declaration Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 18, 2019 | Hearing |
DSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance (-GRANTED ) Filed by Other Parent |
|
June 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Request - Telephonic Appearance Filed by Other Parent |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.