Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doe John, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hathaway Mark Mcclellan, against Regents Of The University Of California, represented by Chen Hailyn Jennifer, Essick Katharine Suzue, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions459 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time459 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: August 31, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 31, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: September 07, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF RUUNG ON PETITIONER'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - of respondent's answer
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SEAL PETITION FOR WRIT
Date: May 21, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 06, 2019Petition - PETITION REDACTED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: June 07, 2019Brief - BRIEF PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: November 25, 2019Reply - REPLY TO NON-OPPOSITION TO WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING APPENDIX CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: November 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 02, 2019Confession of Judgment
Date: December 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: December 03, 2019Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN RETURN TO PEREMPTORY WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE
Date: January 02, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: February 24, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 11, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 16, 2020Reply - REPLY PETITIONER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER A WARDING ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES)
Date: October 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (MOTION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES) | |
October 29, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
October 29, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES) | ||
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held |
|
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees |
|
October 29, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
John Doe, v. Regents of the University of California (UCLA), Judge Mary Strobel Hearing: October 29, 2020 BS174814 Tentative Decision on Motion for Attorneys’ Fees: DENIED Petitioner John Doe (“Petiti...
Judge: Mary H. Strobel |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Katharine Suzue Essick (Attorney): First Name changed from Donald to Katharine; Last Name changed from Margolis to Essick; Organization Name changed from UC Office of the General Counsel to University of California; Middle Name changed from Paul to Suzue | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Katharine Suzue Essick (Attorney) updated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.