Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bradley Delray, Martin Peggye, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Cochran Firm, Seck Ibiere', represented by Dunn Brian T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management443 days |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND DEMURRER
Date: January 10, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT THE COCHRAN FIRM'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF''S MOTION
Date: January 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: January 21, 2020Case Management Order
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS) OF 10/21/2020
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)
Date: October 21, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUEST TO MOVE MOTION
Date: October 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/17/2020
Date: November 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 17, 2020Other - - AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED TRUTH OF FACTS
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/20/2020
Date: November 20, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: December 22, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Opposition to Motion for Sanctions: Name Extension changed from DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND BRIAR'. AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DUNN; EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF to to Motion for Sanctions; As To Parties: removed | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Name Extension changed from TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND DEMURRER to to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; As To Parties: removed | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from Peggye Martin (Plaintiff), Delray Bradley (Plaintiff) to Peggye Martin (Plaintiff), Delray Bradley (Plaintiff) | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Entry Judgment: Name Extension changed from Notice of Entry Judgment to of Entry Judgment; As To Parties changed from Delray Bradley (Plaintiff), Peggye Martin (Plaintiff) to Peggye Martin (Plaintiff), Delray Bradley (Plaintiff) | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Entry Judgment; Filed by: Cochran Firm (Defendant); As to: Delray Bradley (Plaintiff); Peggye Martin (Plaintiff) | |
January 05, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY JUDGMENT | ||
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Proposed Judgment) | |
December 22, 2020 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Proposed Judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment [Proposed] Judgment: Status Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from Peggye Martin (Plaintiff), Delray Bradley (Plaintiff) to Delray Bradley (Plaintiff), Peggye Martin (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.