Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cantor Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Wedge Buster Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 15, 2018 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions46 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeArbitration Award |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT. OR VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: March 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -
Date: March 19, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 30, 2018ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: April 30, 2018TENTATIVE RULING: THE PETITION IS GRANTED.
Date: April 30, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF FILING OR JUDGMENT LIEN
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Address for Jerry J. Jen, Esq. (Attorney) updated | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jerry J. Jen, Esq. (Attorney) | |
April 11, 2019 | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information | ||
April 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jerry J. Jen, Esq. (Attorney) |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv John P. Doyle 8:30 am | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00 | |
June 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 17, 2018 | NOTICE OF FILING OR JUDGMENT LIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.