Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Florida State Of, filed a(n) Civil case against Harrouff Austin Kelly, represented by Ferguson Case Orr Paterson Llp, The Law Offices Of Nellie L. King P.A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
NOTICE OF RULING
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: April 13, 2018NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: April 06, 2018ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF HARRIS J. HUGUENARD, TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Date: April 16, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 16, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -
Date: May 03, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 10, 2018OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: May 14, 2018DECLARATION - OF NELLIE L. KING
Date: May 14, 2018ADDITIONAL DECLARATION OF NELLIE L. KING
Date: May 18, 2018REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: May 18, 2018DECLARATION OF KERI KNOWLES
Date: May 22, 2018PROOF OF DELIVERY
Date: May 22, 2018ORDER ON APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 25, 2018RULING
Date: May 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: May 25, 2018Unknown
Date: June 01, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 12, 2018RULING:
Date: June 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC Re: Payment of Fees Dalila Corral Lyons 1:30 pm | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-04-16 00:00:00 | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter Georgina T. Rizk 11:30 am | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00 | |
June 12, 2018 | Hearing | Calendaring:Ruling on Submitted Matter Georgina T. Rizk | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Judgment by Court-Petition Granted 118 Days | |
June 12, 2018 | Minute Order - | ||
June 12, 2018 | RULING: | ||
June 12, 2018 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.