Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ortega Esther, Soza Joe, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Cribbs Gregory M. Deputy Atty General, Prieto Alexander Baughan, Kazakes Andrew James, Legal Aid Foundation Of Los Angeles, against California Department Of Social Services, Lightbourne Will In His Official, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2018 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions549 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time701 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 07, 2018Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: November 15, 2018Request - Request for leave to file Second Amended Petition per stipulation of the parties
Date: January 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2019Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Stip for Leave to Amend and Proposed Order
Date: February 15, 2019Order - Order Proposed Order Re Request for Leave to Amend
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: April 03, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: April 24, 2019Judgment
Date: July 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: August 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 28, 2019Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: September 13, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED "R"
Date: September 18, 2019Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: October 02, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: October 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2019Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - REVERSED B300321
Date: January 22, 2021Memorandum of Costs on Appeal - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 08, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 09, 2021Writ of Mandate
Date: August 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: November 03, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES
Date: January 19, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: February 09, 2022PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE [CODE OF CIV. PROC. 1094.5, 1085; WEIF. & INST. CODE 10962)
Date: January 22, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: January 25, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 02, 2018NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 13, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Refund / Order (eFiling): Result Date changed from to ; As To Parties: removed | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Joe Soza (Plaintiff) | |
February 09, 2022 | Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING) | ||
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES Proposed Order Re Attorney Fee Award: Filed By: Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant),Esther Ortega (Plaintiff),Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES Proposed Order Re Attorney Fee Award; Signed and Filed by: Esther Ortega (Plaintiff); Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant); As to: California Department of Social Services (Defendant); Will, in his official Lightbourne (Defendant) | |
February 03, 2022 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES PROPOSED ORDER RE ATTORNEY FEE AWARD | ||
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; Signed and Filed by: Esther Ortega (Plaintiff); Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant); As to: Esther Ortega (Plaintiff); Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant) et al. | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES: Filed By: Esther Ortega (Plaintiff),Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant),Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: | |
January 19, 2022 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES | ||
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Esther Ortega (Plaintiff); Joe Soza (Plaintiff); Hunger Action Los Angeles (Appellant); Vacate Future Dates: No |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.