Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lucas Violet Spitzer, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Nesbitt Todd A., against Aq Management & Control, Aq Management & Control Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time-335 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: December 04, 2017VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN [CAL. CIVIL CODE 8490]
Date: December 04, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 07, 2017Minute Order -
Date: December 07, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION
Date: December 18, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN
Date: December 18, 2017PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL
Date: December 18, 2017Minute Order -
Date: January 03, 2018JUDGMENT AND ORDER RELEASING LIEN
Date: January 03, 2018RULING RE: VIOLET SPITZER LUCAS'SVERIFIED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN
Date: January 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00 | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Hearing on Petition Gail Ruderman Feuer 8:31 am | |
January 03, 2018 | Minute Order - | ||
January 03, 2018 | JUDGMENT AND ORDER RELEASING LIEN | ||
January 03, 2018 | RULING RE: VIOLET SPITZER LUCAS'SVERIFIED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN | ||
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Order Filed by Court |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND ORDER RELEASING LIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.