Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aispuro Ray A., Gonzalez Lupita, Mtc Financial Inc. Dba Trustee Corps, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Cisneros Arturo M. Esq., against All Claimants To Surplus Funds After Trustee'S Sale Of Real Property Located At: 7714 Agnes Ave..., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time643 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 18, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: November 15, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: September 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- MTC Financial Inc. (Petitioner): Organization Name changed from MTC FINANCIAL INC, DBA TRUSTEE CORPS to MTC Financial Inc. | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Arturo M. Cisneros, Esq. (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Martus to M. | |
June 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING DATE: June 28, 2019 CASE NUMBER: BS170845 CASE NAME: Kermin Rochman v. Styl’n Construction Inc. SERVICE: Insufficient Motion to Set Aside/ Vacate Dismissal MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Kermin Rochm...
Judge: Richard J. Burdge |
|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Event Type scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing - Other re Claimants' Entitlement to Deposited Surplu...) | |
June 20, 2019 | Hearing | Hearing - Other re Claimants' Entitlement to Deposited Surplus Funds scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing - Other re Claimants' Entitlement to Deposited Surplu...) of ; Filed by: Clerk | |
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other re Claimants' Entitlement to Deposited Surplu...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing - Other re Claimants' Entitlement to Deposited Surplu...) of 06/20/2019) Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.