Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Inglewood Residents Against Takings And, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Carstens Douglas Philip Esq., Durbin Susan Lea, against City Of Inglewood City Council, Governing Board Of The Successor Agency, Inglewood City Of, The Inglewood Parking Authority, The Inglewood Parking Authority Board, (total of 6) See All represented by Bass Jonathan Roger, Jones Royce Kerwin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 04, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - After Court Trial |
Case Cycle Time557 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: July 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD WITH NECESSARY DOCUMENTS
Date: January 08, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 17, 2018CITY OF RNGLEWOOD'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD:; ETC.
Date: January 18, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD WITH NECESSARY DOCUMENTS
Date: January 24, 2018ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: January 31, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: February 20, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: February 23, 2018ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AUGMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: March 02, 2018REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD
Date: February 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B296760; Filed by: Clerk | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B296760; Filed by: Clerk | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Inglewood Residents Against Takings and (Plaintiff) Filed by Inglewood Residents Against Takings and (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B296760) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B296760) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B296760) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:03/28/19 B296760) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Inglewood Residents Against Takings and (Plaintiff) |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.