Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Sahar Nahum, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Welch David Ryan, against Attar Eli, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Carol Boas Goodson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - B283943 | ||
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B283943 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 23, 2018 | Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Fee Waiver as to: eli s. attar | ||
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (Fee Waiver as to: eli s. attar ) | |
May 15, 2018 | Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal - Order to proceed by way of clerk's transcript only. | ||
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (Order to proceed by way of clerk's transcript only. ) | |
April 19, 2018 | Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues | ||
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues ) | |
March 22, 2018 | Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - file provisional approval of court reporter's board | ||
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (file provisional approval of court reporter's board ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.