Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Berger Kahn A Law Corporation, against Gomez Galindo Mendizabel, Burgos Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management420 days |
Filing DateApril 01, 2016 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time258 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference Case Management Conference |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Gregory W. Alarcon 8:30 am | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-05-26 00:00:00 | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Case Management Conference |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff) Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff) |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 258 Days | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff) |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-11-17 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.