Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barrett James G., filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case against Bridges Cynthia, California Department Of Alcoholic, California Office Of The Attorney General, California State Board Of Equalization, California State Controller'S Office, (total of 12) See All represented by O'Donnell Jane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Joanne B. O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time385 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL) | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL) | |
October 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by James G. Barrett (Plaintiff); James G. Barrett (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by California State Board of Equalization (Defendant); California State Controller's Office (Defendant); California Office of the Attorney General (Defendant) |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.