Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young Kristina, Halcomb Kenisha, Winston Kimberly, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Jeter Taunya, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Denied |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 76, Richard E. Rico, Presiding Hrng on Petn Prohibit Harassment - Petition Denied Judge: Richard E. Rico |
|
March 23, 2007 | Hearing |
Response to Harrassment Petition Filed by Respondent |
|
December 27, 2006 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other (CH-125 REISSUE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 03/29/07, AT 8:30A.M., IN DEPT 76 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 20, 2006 | Hearing |
Proof-Personal Service Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Ord-App/Waiver Court Fees & Costs Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
December 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.