Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bichsel Amalgamated, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Jonathon Goody, Oakland Bay Holdings Management Company, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing. No Proof of Service
Date: October 02, 2009Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: June 10, 2010Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: June 10, 2010Civil Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued
Date: April 20, 2010Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: June 04, 2010OEX - Dropped - No Proof of Service
Date: June 04, 2010Order of Examination Issued
Date: April 20, 2010Letter from Monica Sacluti Filed
Date: September 25, 2009Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: August 18, 2009Judgment Entered
Date: March 13, 2009Civil Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued
Date: August 18, 2009Order of Examination Issued
Date: August 18, 2009Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: March 30, 2009Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: March 13, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 13, 2009Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Mark Bichsel Amalgamated Filed
Date: March 13, 2009Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: January 16, 2009Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: January 23, 2009Claim of Plaintiff
Date: January 16, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.