Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bing Udinsky, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Myles Stevens, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
OEX - Dropped - Judgment Satisfied
Date: June 20, 2007Order to Show Cause Settlement Agreement Filed
Date: April 04, 2007Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: June 12, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: April 04, 2007OEX - Continued
Date: April 04, 2007Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: February 01, 2007Order of Examination Issued
Date: January 16, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 13, 2006Judgment Entered
Date: December 13, 2006Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: December 13, 2006Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: November 22, 2006Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: December 08, 2006Claim of Plaintiff Filed
Date: November 13, 2006Claim of Plaintiff
Date: November 13, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.