Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flores Jackelin, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mena Juan Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with John H. Ing presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 17, 2011 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 8, Sandoz, John H., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Sandoz John H. |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 8, Sandoz, John H., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: John H. |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application and Order - Reissuance of RFO (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Flores, Jackelin - Granted on 2011-07-08 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 8, Jones, Anthony, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation Judge: Jones Anthony |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application and Order - Reissuance of RFO (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Flores, Jackelin - Granted on 2011-07-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 8, Jones, Anthony, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation Judge: Anthony |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (TEMP. REST. ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Flores, Jackelin ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (TEMP. REST. ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Flores, Jackelin ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Flores, Jackelin ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.