Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garza, Kylie, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Kendall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian READY FOR HEARING - Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian READY FOR HEARING - Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 12, 2021 | Hearing | Family Court Services Investigator's Report | |
November 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Department of Human Services Letter Received DHS Letter |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Department of Human Services Letter Received DHS Letter |
|
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Consent Nomination and Waiver Consent of mother |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent Nomination and Waiver Consent of mother |
|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Notice to Kern County Family Court Services of Probate Code |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.