Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aguilera, Neli E, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryMinor'S Compromise |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Hearing | order to appear re: Neli E. Aguilera to appear before the court and explain why proof of deposit has not been filed why sanctions should not be imposed up to $1,500.00 for failure to follow court orders and failure to appear for 11/20/2020 hearing | |
April 23, 2021 | Hearing | compliance hearing re: proof of deposit | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | order to appear re: Neli E. Aguilera to appear before the court and explain why proof of deposit has not been filed why sanctions should not be imposed up to $1,500.00 for failure to follow court orders and failure to appear for 11/20/2020 hearing | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | compliance hearing re: proof of deposit | |
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING - RE: Proof of Deposit NOTE - 1. As of 11/05/2020, Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account (MC-356) has not been filed. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING - RE: Proof of Deposit NOTE - 1. As of 11/05/2020, Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account (MC-356) has not been filed. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing RE: Proof of Deposit |
|
July 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account
Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
July 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Order Approving Compromise / Disposition
Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account
Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.