Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cosgrove, John Kevin, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryPetition For Probate |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time1206 days |
Petition for Probate of Will
Date: October 15, 2015Order to Appear
Date: March 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Attachment for Defaulters Returned Expired AS TO JOHN KEVIN COSGROVE |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Attachment for Defaulters Returned Expired AS TO JOHN KEVIN COSGROVE |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing re: petition for final distribution Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. 2. Page 6 re fee base does not total $282,186.06 and should be $282,611. 52, to which fee computation will be also need to be adjusted. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing re: petition for final distribution Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 12/05/2018 Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. 2. Page 6 re fee base does not total $282,186.06 and should be $282,611. 52, to which fee computation will be also need to be adjusted. Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
December 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Amendment Second Amendment to Final Petition |
|
December 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Amendment First amendment to Account and Report and Petition for Settlement |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amendment First amendment to Account and Report and Petition for Settlement |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amendment Second Amendment to Final Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.