Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cushnie Marianna filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mary Thornton House presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2015 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time514 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Distribution (Marianna Cushnie ) Filed by Administrator |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed by Administrator |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Distribution (Marianna Cushnie ) Filed by Administrator |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Administrator |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver Filed by Administrator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.