Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Northern Trust Company, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark S. Priver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Account | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Garcia Ruben |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Garcia Ruben |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.