Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Koscki Katherine J., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time110 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (CONFIRMING TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (CONFIRMING TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 67, Cunningham, David S., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Cunningham David S. |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Supplement (TO PETITION TO CONFIRM TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Supplement (TO PETITION TO CONFIRM TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 67, Cunningham, David S., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Cunningham David S. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Pursuant to Probate Code Sec 17200 (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested PETITION TO CONFIRM TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Pursuant to Probate Code Sec 17200 (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested PETITION TO CONFIRM TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO TRUST 1st Hearing Date: 07/22/2015 Filed By: Koscki, Katherine J., Petitioner Repres By: Armour, Randall D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.