Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Villanueva Juanita, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Muro Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maria E. Stratton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time258 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Maria E. |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (Filed By: Muro, Gloria, Respondent Repres By: Byrnes, Valiere M., Esq., Attorney for Respondent ) | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Maria E. |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal (DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED; PETN TO BE DISMISSED MUST BE IDENTIFIED BY CAPTION AND FILING DATE Filed By: Villanueva, Juanita, Petitioner Repres By: Price, William C., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Pursuant to Probate Code Sec 17200 (Judgment by Court-Petition Denied After Trial - Uncontested PETN. TO ENFORCE NO CONTEST CLAUSE AGAINST JUANITA VILLANUEVA AND JUAN VILADEZ 1st Hearing Date: 02/11/2016 Filed By: Muro, Gloria, Respondent Repres By: Byrnes, Valiere M., Esq., Attorney for Respondent Complaint Num: 2 ) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL Filed By: Byrnes, Valiere M., Esq., Attorney for Respondent ) | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Maria E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.