Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scrigna Angelo Yoshannah, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Appointment - Held Judge: Brenda J. |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (SECOND Filed By: Shuwarger, Jeffrey, Esq., PVP Attorney ) | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Objection (Filed By: Scrigna, Angelo Yoshannah, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Appointment - Held - Continued Judge: Brenda J. |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Objection (Filed By: Shuwarger, Jeffrey, Esq., PVP Attorney ) | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Appointment - Held - Continued Judge: Brenda J. |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Appointment - Held Judge: Brenda J. |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed By: Pearson, Robert E., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Appointment - Held - Continued Judge: Brenda J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.