Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abeyta Christine Scott, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with David S. Wesley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Cunningham, David S., Presiding Appointment - Held Judge: David S. |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner ) | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner ) | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) (Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner ) | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice (Filed by: Court ) | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Objection (Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Vanderlee, Tamara Lynn, Objector ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) (christine scott abeyta Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted 2014-08-19 Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - UCCJEA (Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Fee waiver requested (Filed By: Abeyta, Christine Scott, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.