Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reyes Marsha, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marvin M. Lager presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2012 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Change of Address (Repres By: Seegman, Richard, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Reyes, Marsha, Petitioner ) | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Change of Address (Repres By: Seegman, Richard, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Reyes, Marsha, Petitioner ) | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Order (Filed By: Reyes, Marsha, Petitioner Repres By: Ledwitz, Samuel B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Order (Filed By: Reyes, Marsha, Petitioner Repres By: Ledwitz, Samuel B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum - Costs ($445.00 COST ENTERED ON Repres By: Seegman, Richard, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Reyes, Marsha, Petitioner ) | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.