Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goetz Steven, Bradbury Susan, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mitchell L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time872 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Receipt (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar Judge: Mitchell L. |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar Judge: Mitchell L. |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order (ORDER TO INVALIDATE TRUST AMENDMENT AND REINSTATE TRUSTEES Filed By: Goetz, Steven, Petitioner Repres By: Bradbury, Susan, Petitioner ) | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Filed By: Goetz, Steven, Petitioner Filed By: Bradbury, Susan, Petitioner Repres By: Lumsdaine, Joseph A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Consent (Filed By: Goetz, Steven, Petitioner Filed By: Bradbury, Susan, Petitioner Repres By: Lumsdaine, Joseph A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held Judge: Mitchell L. |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Mitchell L. |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Ruling (Filed By: Goetz, Steven, Petitioner Filed By: Bradbury, Susan, Petitioner Repres By: Lumsdaine, Joseph A., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Mitchell L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.