Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Slater Nancy, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (Filed by: Surety Company ) | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (PROOF OF BOND Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Filed By: Slater, Nancy, Petitioner Repres By: Kramar, Steven D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed By: Slater, Nancy, Petitioner Repres By: Kramar, Steven D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.