Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzales Naomi, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Reva G. Goetz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Order - Spousal Property (Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Order - Spousal Property (Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding Spousal Property Hearing - Held Spousal Property Hearing - Held Judge: Goetz Reva |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding Spousal Property Hearing - Held Judge: Reva |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplement (SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplement (SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed By: Gonzales, Naomi, Petitioner Repres By: Perrizo, Mark J., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.