Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Little Claude, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Aviva K. Bobb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time3420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Order (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Bobb, Aviva K., Presiding Petition Hearing - Held Judge: Aviva K. |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Supplement (TO PET. TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROERTY Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition - Determine Succession to Real Property (1st Hearing Date: 01/24/2007 Filed By: Little, Claude, Petitioner Repres By: Clark, Elford H. Law offices of, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.