Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tomelinson Natalie, Navarro Rachel, Navarro Margie, Aldama Joseph, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Aviva K. Bobb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time3420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | TERM: Approval of Final Distribution | |
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed By: Aldama, Joseph, Petitioner Repres By: Manago, Ollie P., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Account (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Bobb, Aviva K., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing - Held Judge: Aviva K. |
|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal (TOTAL: $70,000.00 Filed By: Aldama, Joseph, Petitioner Repres By: Manago, Ollie P., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal (TOTAL: $280,000.00 Filed By: Aldama, Joseph, Petitioner Repres By: Manago, Ollie P., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Bobb, Aviva K., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Aviva K. |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Bobb, Aviva K., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Aviva K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.