Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchell, Muriel E., filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Ramonet, Kenneth E., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2005 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Jon Rantzman |
||
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 12/30/2005 10:00 AM D- 201 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Not Found or Non Service Return Filed | |
December 16, 2005 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Jon Rantzman |
||
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Amended Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 12/16/2005 10:00 AM D- 201 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.