Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DV-800DV-800 |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DV-800DV-800 |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.