Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wallace, Alexander, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wallace, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Green, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 07, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 20, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 17, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 14, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 07, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 03/14/24 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 4 MINORS Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
June 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 03/14/24 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 4 MINORS |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 02/26/2024 NOTICE OF FCCR HEARING 4 MINORS |
|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 02/26/2024 NOTICE OF FCCR HEARING 4 MINORS Judge: Moran, Kevin |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 03/14/24 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 4 MINORS Hearing Date: 06/06/24 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
March 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 03/14/24 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 4 MINORS Hearing Date: 06/06/24 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 21, 2024 | Hearing | At-Issue Memorandum | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order re Modification of Child Support | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 8/10/22 DCSS NOM JDG CS HC PARENTAGE STND ORDS 4 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/10/22 & 12/5/22 2/16/23 3/27/23 6/6/23 **T/E 2 HRS** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.