Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alsubari, Emad Musaed, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lara-Alsubari, Amanda Fay, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner SET FROM 2/8/22 RE: DATE OF SEPARATION Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner SET FROM 2/8/22 RE: DATE OF SEPARATION Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 08, 2022 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner 12/30/21 PET SET FOR TRIAL AND RES TO FILE FL-141 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 12/30/21 PET SET FOR TRIAL AND RES TO FILE FL-141 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
January 13, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Reassignment from Judge Webster to Commissioner | |
January 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Proof of Service by Mail 02/08/2022 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail 02/08/2022 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
December 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for Order (FL-300) Petitioner's Request for Order re: Other |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (FL-300) Petitioner's Request for Order re: Other |
|
August 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure E-FILED: Petitioner's Declaration Re Service of Preliminary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.