Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hall, Virginia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hall, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 23, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial1089 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner 08/19/2021 PET ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGEMENT Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 08/19/2021 PET ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGEMENT Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
August 20, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Electronic Service | |
August 20, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of service by Mail | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Mail | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) Request for Order |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) Request for Order |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Declaration of Payment History |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Wage & Earnings Assignment Order
Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.