Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cottrell, Aimee Nicole, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cottrell, Kenneth John, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cannon, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2019 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) CONT FROM 8/16/19 09/26/19 ***COURT TO ADDRESS CONSOLIDATION*** Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) CONT FROM 8/16/19 09/26/19 ***COURT TO ADDRESS CONSOLIDATION*** Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
September 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) CONT FROM 8/16/19 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) CONT FROM 8/16/19 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
August 22, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Consolidated - Child Case ALL HEARINGS AND FILINGS ARE TO PROCEED IN THE LEAD/PARENT CASE BFL-17-001403 |
|
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 7/09/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 2 MINORS (BFL-18-1403) Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated - Child Case ALL HEARINGS AND FILINGS ARE TO PROCEED IN THE LEAD/PARENT CASE BFL-17-001403 |
|
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing FOR FCCR HRG 8/16/19 DIV. B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.