Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2022 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULTDEFAULT |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service A SIMPLE DIVORCEA SIMPLE DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.