Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miller, Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller Jr, Lee Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cynthia L. Loo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions309 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time357 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
November 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) STATUS END DATE: 11/22/17 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) STATUS END DATE: 11/22/17 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
November 08, 2017 | Hearing | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) | |
November 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT |
|
September 01, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.