Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zelayandia, Will, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zelayandia, Luz Rosales, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Fielder, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryLegal Separation With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions281 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/18/18 FILED BY DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/18/18 FILED BY DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 06/06/18 RES MOD C/C C/V C/S 4 MINORS **DIV A CAL ALSO** Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS) 06/06/18 RES MOD C/C C/V C/S 4 MINORS **ALSO ON DIV D CAL** Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 06/06/18 RES MOD C/C C/V C/S 4 MINORS **DIV A CAL ALSO** Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS) 06/06/18 RES MOD C/C C/V C/S 4 MINORS **ALSO ON DIV D CAL** Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY MOTHER |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY MOTHER |
|
June 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Responsive Declaration HRG 07/18/2018 DIV A FILED BY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.