Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Torres, Dionicio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Torres, Amanda Ann, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
January 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY FATHER 2 MINORS |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY FATHER 2 MINORS |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
December 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole TOTAL FEES $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole TOTAL FEES $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW FEES: $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Waiver of Fees PET FW FEES: $520.00 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 15, 2016 | Hearing | Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.