Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vasquez, Clotilde, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rodriguez Hernandez, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Fielder, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2015 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for CLETS Entry |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for CLETS Entry |
|
September 30, 2015 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for CLETS Entry |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for CLETS Entry |
|
September 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS EXP 09/23/2018 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS EXP 09/23/2018 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
September 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN |
|
September 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRO Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRO Judge: Fielder, John L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.