Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Martinez, Camillo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Loo, Cynthia L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2023 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
DCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 03, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 19, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 02/06/24 DCSS NOM JUDG C/S H/C PARENTAGE STND ORDR 3 MINORS |
|
April 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 02/06/24 DCSS NOM JUDG C/S H/C PARENTAGE STND ORDR 3 MINORS Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice ANSWER |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: New Attorney: |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: New Attorney: |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice ANSWER |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail NOM HRG 04/24/2024 |
|
February 27, 2024 | Hearing |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail NOM HRG 04/24/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.