Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) case against Jillian R Lamas, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2021 |
Last RefreshedJune 05, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail NOM HRG 6/6/2023NOM HRG 6/6/2023 |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 03/15/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR IMPUTE EARNINGS 4 MINORS Hearing Date: 06/06/23 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: ARe: 03/15/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR IMPUTE EARNINGS 4 MINORS Hearing Date: 06/06/23 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Initial | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DCSS: Request to Enter Default | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DCSS: Declaration for Default | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint E-FILED E-FILED |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations E-FILEDE-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.