Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Astorga, Alejandra Y, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 09/07/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDR 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 09/07/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDR 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
September 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDR 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 10/18/21 Hearing Time: 08:00AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDR 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 10/18/21 Hearing Time: 08:00AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
July 12, 2021 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
July 01, 2021 | Hearing |
DCSS: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint E-FILED |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint E-FILED |
|
March 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations E-FILED |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.