Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Alva Jr, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBittleston, Dawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2019 | Hearing |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) HRG 8/19/19 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) HRG 8/19/19 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 7/5/19 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 7/5/19 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
July 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STNDRD ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 8/19/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STNDRD ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 8/19/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
May 29, 2019 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
April 16, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint | |
January 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations Summons and Complaint |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.