Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gibson, Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cynthia L. Loo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/02/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDRS 2 MINORS Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/02/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDRS 2 MINORS Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) EMAILED COPY TO DCSS Re: 11/02/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDRS 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 01/04/22 Hearing Time: 08:00 Hearing Department/Division:A |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) EMAILED COPY TO DCSS Re: 11/02/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDRS 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 01/04/22 Hearing Time: 08:00 Hearing Department/Division:A |
|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
DCSS Order of Exam 03/29/19 DCSS ENFORCEMENT OF JUDG 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
DCSS Order of Exam 03/29/19 DCSS ENFORCEMENT OF JUDG 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
May 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service OEX SERVED |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service OEX SERVED |
|
March 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Appear for Exam (Family Law/DCSS) ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear for Exam (Family Law/DCSS) ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.